EP0534972 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECLAIMING GYPSUM FROM WASTE WALLBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.P.RESEARCH LTD. 8894 River Road Delta British Columbia V4G 1B5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states G.P.RESEARCH LTD. 8894 River Road Delta, British Columbia V4G 1B5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACLEOD, Bruce, Colin 10800 Palmberg Road Richmond, British Columbia V6W 1C6 / CA | 02 /
BURLEY, Keith, Alexander 7486 148 Street Surrey, British Columbia V3S 3E7 / CA | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 91901656.8 | 08.01.1991 | [1993/14] | WO1991CA00006 | Priority number, date | US19900544289 | 26.06.1990 Original published format: US 544289 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200152 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534972 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534972 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, B28B17/00, B26F3/00 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
B29C63/0013 (EP,US);
B09B3/00 (EP,US);
B28B17/00 (EP,US);
Y10S264/914 (EP,US);
Y10S264/915 (EP,US);
Y10T156/11 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1174 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON GIPS AUS VERBUNDPLATTENABFALL | [1993/14] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECLAIMING GYPSUM FROM WASTE WALLBOARD | [1993/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RECUPERER DU GYPSE A PARTIR DE DECHETS DE CLOISONS DE PLATRE | [1993/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.01.1995 | [2000/05] | Cited in | International search | US3951727 [ ] (GREENBERG WILLIAM B); | DE2709975 [ ] (H & S REINECKE KG); | EP0031797 [ ] (ALUSUISSE [CH]); | EP0073864 [ ] (GYPROC BENELUX NV [BE]) |