EP0465614 - PROCESS FOR DETERMINING THE WORKING STROKE OF A FOUR-STROKE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENTENMANN, Robert Beihingerweg 15 D-7141 Benningen / DE | 02 /
ROHDE, Siegfried Seitenstrasse 10 D-7141 Oberriexingen / DE | 03 /
STENGEL, Bernhard Eckenerstrasse 6 D-7146 Tamm / DE | 04 /
UNLAND, Stefan Richard-Wagner-Strasse 16 D-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | 05 /
PHILIPP, Matthias Guglingweg 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | 06 /
TORNO, Oskar Schillerstrasse 10 D-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | 07 /
ROTHHAAR, Ulrich Oderstrasse 21 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | [1992/03] | Application number, filing date | 91901700.4 | 17.01.1991 | [1992/03] | WO1991DE00028 | Priority number, date | DE19904002228 | 26.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4002228 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111602 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465614 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465614 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/36, F02D41/14 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
F02D41/009 (EP);
F02D35/023 (EP);
F02D35/027 (EP);
F02D41/36 (EP);
F02P7/077 (EP);
F02B2075/027 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ARBEITSTAKTERKENNUNG BEI EINEM VIERTAKTMOTOR | [1992/03] | English: | PROCESS FOR DETERMINING THE WORKING STROKE OF A FOUR-STROKE ENGINE | [1992/03] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA DETECTION DU TEMPS MOTEUR DANS LE CAS D'UN MOTEUR A QUATRE TEMPS | [1992/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 17.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 11.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 06.09.1994 | Appeal received No. T0759/94 | 06.09.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.11.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 28.11.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP54137524 ; | [X]WO8705971 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]DE2658614 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]GB2130760 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [AP]WO9002871 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 158 (M-86) 25 Dezember 1979, & JP-A-54 137524 (HINO JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 25 Oktober 1979, siehe das ganze Dokument, & JP54137524 A 00000000 | Examination | DE3506114 |