EP0509033 - 4,4'- 9H-FLUOREN-9-YLIDENEBIS(METHYLENE) -BISPYRIMIDINE FOR TREATING NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/43] | 4,4'- 9H-FLUOREN-9-YLIDENEBIS(METHYLENE)]-BISPYRIMIDINE FOR TREATING NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS | ||
[2007/46] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY Barley Mill Plaza, Building 25 Wilmington Delaware 19880-0025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY Barley Mill Plaza, Building 25 Wilmington, Delaware 19880-0025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENOBLE, Victor, John 1200 Camp Woods Court Newark, DE 19711 / US | 02 /
EARL, Richard, Alan 43 Ross Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/26] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1992/43] | von Kreisler, Alek (DE) Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902326.7 | 27.12.1990 | [1992/43] | WO1990US07414 | Priority number, date | US19900464433 | 12.01.1990 Original published format: US 464433 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110433 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509033 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/43] | A61K31/505, C07D239/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/43] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG NEUROLOGISCHER STÖRUNGEN MIT 4,4'-9H-FLUOREN-Q-YLIDENBIS(METHYLEN)-BISPYRIMIDIN | [1992/43] | English: | 4,4'- 9H-FLUOREN-9-YLIDENEBIS(METHYLENE) -BISPYRIMIDINE FOR TREATING NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS | [2007/46] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES NEUROLOGIQUES A L'AIDE DE 4,4'- 9H-FLUORENE-9-YLIDENEBIS(METHYLENE) -BISPYRIMIDINE | [2007/46] |
Former [1992/43] | 4,4'- 9H-FLUOREN-9-YLIDENEBIS(METHYLENE)]-BISPYRIMIDINE FOR TREATING NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS | ||
Former [1992/43] | TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES NEUROLOGIQUES A L'AIDE DE 4,4'- 9H-FLUORENE-9-YLIDENEBIS(METHYLENE)]-BISPYRIMIDINE | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1992 | Search fee paid | 03.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 03.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 04.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4806651 (BRYANT III WALTER M [US], et al); | [XD]EP0311010 (DU PONT [US]) | International search | [A]US4760083 (MYERS MELVYN J [US], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 111, 1989, (EARL et al.) 111: 153640u; Preparation and testing of alpha, alpha-disubstituted aromatic and heteroaromatics as cognition enhancers. |