EP0458957 - FUSION PIPE JOINING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPONOR ALDYL COMPANY New Castle Corporate Commons, 57 Read's Way New Castle Delaware 19720-1618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states UPONOR ALDYL COMPANY New Castle Corporate Commons, 57 Read's Way New Castle, Delaware 19720-1618 / US | ||
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states RAYCHEM CORPORATION 300 Constitution Drive Menlo Park California 94025 / US | ||
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states METCAL INC. 1530 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, James, M. 149C Escuela Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
WALTER, Larry, A. 38322 Logan Drive Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 03 /
BARTON, Peter, A. 2812 Arlington Road Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Dibb Lupton Alsop Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | ||
Former [1996/09] | Auckland Cooke, Jacqueline, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | ||
Former [1991/49] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91902333.3 | 10.12.1990 | [1991/49] | WO1990US07131 | Priority number, date | US19890451179 | 15.12.1989 Original published format: US 451179 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109247 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458957 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458957 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/02 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
F16L47/03 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C65/32 (EP,US);
B29C65/3632 (EP,US);
B29C65/3644 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/1222 (EP,US);
B29C66/1224 (EP,US);
B29C66/324 (EP,US);
B29C66/348 (EP,US);
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C66/5229 (EP,US);
B29C66/52292 (EP,US);
B29C66/73116 (EP,US);
B29C66/91411 (EP,US);
B29C66/91431 (EP,US);
B29C66/91655 (EP,US);
F16L47/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/3656 (EP,US);
B29C65/3668 (EP,US);
B29C65/368 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/72321 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | SCHMELZVERBINDEN VON ROHRSYSTEMEN UND DAS VERFAHREN HIERZU | [1991/49] | English: | FUSION PIPE JOINING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [1991/49] | French: | SYSTEME DE RACCORD PAR FUSION DE TUYAUX ET PROCEDE S'Y RAPPORTANT | [1991/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1991 | Search fee paid | 10.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1996 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2393541 (FRED KOHLER); | [A]US3455761 (RUBEL PETER A); | [Y]DE1704205 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH); | [A]DE2405333 (SUNDIN PER OVE); | [X]WO8102405 (HAXEY ENG LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO8202593 (PAYNE NICHOLAS JOHN [GB]); | [A]EP0107096 (HELLER WILLIAM C JUN [US]); | [Y]WO8500263 (METCAL INC [US]); | [A]EP0158434 (METCAL INC [US]); | [A]EP0281396 (MATERIAL ENG TECH LAB INC [JP]) | International search | [X]WO8002124 (HAXEY ENG LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]WO8402098 (METCAL INC [US]); | [Y]US4695335 (LYALL LUCIAN H [US]) |