EP0457899 - CUSTOMIZED PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Robert, C. 2616 Granada Drive Loveland, CO 80538 / US | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing. KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902363.0 | 11.12.1990 | [1991/48] | WO1990US07251 | Priority number, date | US19890449639 | 12.12.1989 Original published format: US 449639 | US19900490516 | 01.03.1990 Original published format: US 490516 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108956 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457899 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457899 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/32, B65D75/38 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
B65D75/14 (EP,US);
B65D75/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1991/48] | Title | German: | PRODUKTANGEPASSTE VERPACKUNG | [1991/48] | English: | CUSTOMIZED PACKAGING | [1991/48] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT PERSONNALISE | [1991/48] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Request for further processing for: | 04.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR513270 [ ] (GUSTAV LOHOFF [DE]); | US2005967 [ ] (BERDAN KENNETH D); | US3666166 [ ] (FREAKES ANTHONY); | US2589604 [ ] (CUNNINGHAM GALE C, et al) |