EP0513040 - RADAR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Industries Public Limited Company 765, Finchley Road London, NW11 8DS / GB | [1992/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNAH, David, Anthony 14 Purcell Cole Writtle, Chelmsford, Essex CM1 3NB / GB | 02 /
BLUNDY, Keith, James 19 Donald Drive, Chadwell Heath Romford, Essex RM6 5EB / GB | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Flint, Jonathan McNeill Smiths Group plc and Subsidiary Companies 765 Finchley Road London NW11 8DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Flint, Jonathan McNeill SMITHS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 765 Finchley Road London NW11 8DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91902381.2 | 11.01.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991GB00038 | Priority number, date | GB19900001954 | 29.01.1990 Original published format: GB 9001954 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111733 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513040 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513040 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/06, H04N3/30 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
H04N3/30 (EP,US);
G01S7/06 (EP,US);
G01S7/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/47] | Title | German: | RADARGERÄT | [1992/47] | English: | RADAR APPARATUS | [1992/47] | French: | APPAREIL RADAR | [1992/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 10.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.12.1994 | FR | 07.12.1994 | IT | 07.12.1994 | LI | 07.12.1994 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | CH | 07.12.1994 | |
IT | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
FR | 05.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | CH | 07.12.1994 | |
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
FR | 05.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/31] | CH | 07.12.1994 | |
LI | 07.12.1994 | Cited in | International search | GB877436 [ ] (RAYTHEON CO); | US3431459 [ ] (FREEBORN JOHN C); | GB2169165 [ ] (MARS G B LTD); | GB2215935 [ ] (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) |