EP0513049 - PROCESS FOR THE MECHANICAL TREATMENT OF FLUID TO SLIGHTLY VISCOUS MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GABOR, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Im Holzgarten 2/1 71665 Vaihingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states GABOR, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Im Holzgarten 2/1 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Thul, Leo Patentanwalt Hoffmannstrasse 26 D-70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Thul, Leo, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Hoffmannstrasse 26 D-70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902605.4 | 30.01.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991DE00087 | Priority number, date | DE19904002614 | 30.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4002614 | [1992/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111251 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513049 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513049 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/12, B01F3/08, B01F3/04 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
B01F23/23421 (EP,US);
B01F23/20 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1992/47] | B01F3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MECHANISCHEN BEHANDLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN BIS DÜNNBREIIGEN MEDIEN | [1992/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MECHANICAL TREATMENT OF FLUID TO SLIGHTLY VISCOUS MEDIA | [1992/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT MECANIQUE DE MILIEUX LIQUIDES A LEGEREMENT VISQUEUX | [1992/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP51132173 ; | GB127705 [ ] (KIRKHAM HULETT AND CHANDLER LT [GB], et al); | FR568836 [ ]; | US2268219 [ ] (LYONS EMERSON J, et al); | US2560526 [ ] (THOMPSON PARKE H); | CH298868 [ ] (GIOVANOLA FRERES SA [CH]); | FR1375822 [ ] (BUSS AG); | DE1963614 [ ] (BAMAG VERFAHRENSTECHNIK GMBH); | BE884216 [ ] (HAEGEMAN JOHNY H); | CH654560 [ ] (PAUL KETTERER) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Band 1, Nr. 21 (C-76)(914), 25. April 1977; & JP-A-51132173 (SUMITOMO KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 17. November 1976, & JP51132173 A 00000000 |