EP0462262 - COPOLYMERIZED METHINE COLORANT-POLYESTER COLOR CONCENTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | ||
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUTAK, James, John, Sr. 6305 Booth Court Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 02 /
PARHAM, William, Whitfield 1917 Hermitage Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 03 /
WEAVER, Max, Allen 125 Hill Road Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 04 /
COATES, Clarence, Alvin, Jr. Rt. 13 Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 05 /
OLDFIELD, Terry, Ann 681 Big Ridge Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/52] | Parent, Yves Kodak-Pathé Département Brevets et Licences CRT 60/1 -Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91902637.7 | 03.01.1991 | [1991/52] | WO1991US00019 | Priority number, date | US19900461961 | 08.01.1990 Original published format: US 461961 | [1991/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110693 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462262 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/685, C09B69/10 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
C08G63/6858 (EP,US);
C08G63/685 (KR);
C09B69/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/52] | Title | German: | FARBSTOFFKONZENTRATE AUS COPOLYMERISIERTEM METHIN-FARBSTOFFPOLYESTER | [1991/52] | English: | COPOLYMERIZED METHINE COLORANT-POLYESTER COLOR CONCENTRATES | [1991/52] | French: | CONCENTRES DE COULEURS A BASE D'UN POLYESTER ET D'UN COLORANT AU METHYNE COPOLYMERISE | [1991/52] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.08.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/52] | Appeal following examination | 02.10.1995 | Appeal received No. T0424/97 | 22.11.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.07.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 27.07.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.08.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US480471 [ ]; | US4378228 [ ] (BEATTY CHARLES L, et al); | WO8910349 [ ] (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |