EP0495929 - EQUIPMENT FOR MEASURING OUT LUMPS OF DOUGH USUALLY CALLED DOUGH DIVIDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rijkaart, Lodewijk Cornelis Kijftenbeltlaan 29 NL-3871 BC Hoevelaken / NL | [1992/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/31] | Application number, filing date | 91902862.1 | 28.01.1991 | [1992/31] | WO1991NL00011 | Priority number, date | NL19900000440 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: NL 9000440 | [1992/31] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112723 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495929 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A21C5/02 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
A21C5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABMESSEN VON TEIGPORTIONEN | [1992/31] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR MEASURING OUT LUMPS OF DOUGH USUALLY CALLED DOUGH DIVIDER | [1992/31] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE MESURE DE MOTTES DE PATE, OU DIVISEUR DE PATE | [1992/31] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1991 | Translation filed | 10.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU | 30.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/10] | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.02.1992 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.1992 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | 10.02.1992 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.04.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   28.04.1992 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2427052 [ ]; | FR2353833 [ ]; | US3481283 [ ] |