EP0472676 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stribel GmbH Benzstrasse 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states Stribel GmbH Benzstrasse D-72636 Frickenhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRISSLER, Friedrich Gaussstrasse 40 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91903205.2 | 15.02.1991 | [1992/10] | WO1991EP00299 | Priority number, date | DE19904005141 | 17.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4005141 | [1992/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112549 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472676 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0472676 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/2808 (EP);
G02B6/4202 (EP);
G02B6/421 (EP);
G02B6/424 (EP);
G02B6/4246 (EP);
G02B6/4249 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/10] | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNG | [1992/10] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION LINE | [1992/10] | French: | CABLE DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX | [1992/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3113168 ; | [X]DD246405 (LIEBKNECHT TRANSFORMAT [DD]); | [A]US4733934 (WAIS THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]DD200965 (MICHAILOFF MICHAIL); | [A]EP0336167 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | Examination | DE3109888 |