EP0516650 - A MOWER CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KVERNELAND TAARUP A/S Taarup Strandvej 5300 Kerteminde / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states KVERNELAND TAARUP A/S Taarup Strandvej DK-5300 Kerteminde / DK | ||
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states MASKINFABRIKEN TAARUP A/S Taarup Strandvej DK-5300 Kerteminde / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAURITSEN, Georg Heibergsvej 23 DK-5300 Kerteminde / DK | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | WITTRUP, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 91903439.7 | 01.02.1991 | [1992/50] | WO1991DK00029 | Priority number, date | DK19900000267 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: DK 26790 | [1992/50] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111099 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516650 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516650 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01D43/00, A01D34/66, A01D67/00 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
A01D67/00 (EP,US);
Y10S56/03 (EP,US);
Y10S56/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/50] | Title | German: | MÄHWERK MIT AUFBEREITER | [1994/51] | English: | A MOWER CONDITIONER | [1992/50] | French: | CONDITIONNEUR POUR TONDEUSE A GAZON | [1992/50] |
Former [1992/50] | Mähwerk mit Aufbereiter | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1991 | Translation filed | 21.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.12.1994 | CH | 21.12.1994 | ES | 21.12.1994 | GR | 21.12.1994 | IT | 21.12.1994 | LI | 21.12.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | BE | 21.12.1994 | |
CH | 21.12.1994 | ||
GR | 21.12.1994 | ||
IT | 21.12.1994 | ||
LI | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.12.1994 | |
CH | 21.12.1994 | ||
IT | 21.12.1994 | ||
LI | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/42] | BE | 21.12.1994 | |
CH | 21.12.1994 | ||
LI | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | CH | 21.12.1994 | |
LI | 21.12.1994 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4719742 (ERMACORA RINO [FR], et al); | [A]US4177625 (KNIGHT ANDREW C [GB], et al); | [A]CH510975 (BUCHER GUYER AG MASCH [CH]); | [A]US4843804 (WELLMAN STANLEY P [US]); | [A]EP0338649 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) |