EP0513125 - AN EMERGENCY SHUT-OFF DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROMANO, Rosa Via Dante, 7 I-22070 Veniano / IT | [1992/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 91903537.8 | 28.01.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991EP00155 | Priority number, date | IT19900067086 | 06.02.1990 Original published format: IT 6708690 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112459 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513125 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513125 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/10 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
F16L55/1007 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1654 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87941 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1992/47] | Title | German: | NOTABSPERRVORRICHTUNG | [1992/47] | English: | AN EMERGENCY SHUT-OFF DEVICE | [1992/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION DE SECOURS POUR CANALISATIONS | [1992/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4295484 (MEISENHEIMER JR DANIEL T); | [A]US4625746 (CALVIN JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]US4643216 (ALLREAD ALAN R [US], et al); | [A]US4667883 (FINK JR ARTHUR C [US]) |