EP0511306 - TUMOR KILLING EFFECTS OF ENTEROTOXINS AND RELATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terman, David S. 3183 Palmero Way Pebble Beach, CA 93953 / US | For all designated states STONE, Jay L. 7325 Viewpoint Rd. Aptos, CA 95003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states TERMAN, David S. 3183 Palermo Way Pebble Beach, CA 93953 / US | ||
For all designated states STONE, Jay L. 7325 Viewpoint Rd. Aptos, CA 95003 / US | |||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states TERMAN, David S. 3183 Palermo Way Pepple Beach, CA 93953 / US | ||
For all designated states STONE, Jay L. 7325 Wiewpoint Rd. Aptos, CA 95003 / US | |||
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states TERMAN, David S. 3183 Palermo Way Pepple Beach, CA 93953 / US | ||
For all designated states STONE, Jay L. 2695 Estate Drive Aptos, CA 95003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/45] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/29] | Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/03] | Wichmann, Hendrik Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Liebherrstrasse 20 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/50] | Keussen, Christof, Dr., et al Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1996/20] | O'Brien, Caroline Jane, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/45] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91903963.6 | 17.01.1991 | [1992/45] | WO1991US00342 | Priority number, date | US19900466577 | 17.01.1990 Original published format: US 466577 | [1992/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110680 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0511306 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0511306 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/31, A61K38/16 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/315 (EP);
A61K31/192 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/4632 (EP);
A61K39/464821 (EP);
A61K39/464822 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/464821, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/464822, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/45] | C07K7/10, C07K13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/45] | Title | German: | TUMOR-ZERSTÖRENDE EFFEKTE VON ENTEROTOXINEN UND VERWANDTEN VERBINDUNGEN | [1992/45] | English: | TUMOR KILLING EFFECTS OF ENTEROTOXINS AND RELATED COMPOUNDS | [1992/45] | French: | EFFETS DES ENTEROTOXINES ET DE COMPOSES APPARENTES POUR L'ELIMINATION DE TUMEURS | [1992/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1992 | Search fee paid | 14.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 13.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 06.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.10.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01102715.8 / EP1103268 | EP01104586.1 / EP1129717 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.2003
19.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE ACTIVE BIOTECH AB PO Box 724, Scheelevagen 22 SE-220 07 Lund / SE Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.2003
ACTIVE BIOTECH AB PO Box 724, Scheelevagen 22 SE-220 07 Lund / SE Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | 22.05.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.07.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.04.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/23] | Request for further processing for: | 28.12.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.2002 | Decision despatched | 27.08.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.1998 | Decision despatched | 26.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 15.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.07.2002 | BE | 17.07.2002 | CH | 17.07.2002 | GR | 17.07.2002 | LI | 17.07.2002 | NL | 17.07.2002 | DK | 17.10.2002 | LU | 17.01.2003 | ES | 30.01.2003 | IT | 17.01.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 17.07.2002 | |
BE | 17.07.2002 | ||
CH | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
LU | 17.01.2003 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 17.07.2002 | |
BE | 17.07.2002 | ||
CH | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 17.07.2002 | |
BE | 17.07.2002 | ||
CH | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 17.07.2002 | |
CH | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 17.07.2002 | |
CH | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 17.07.2002 | |
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | NL | 17.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 97, no. 2, February 1986, pages 371-385; C.D. PLATSOUCAS et al.: "Immunomodulation of human leukocytes by staphylococcal enterotoxin A: augmentation of natural killer cells and induction of suppressor cells" | International search | [Y]WO8802632 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) | [X] - Biological Abstracts, Volume 88, No. 7, issued 01 October 1989, SHCHEGLOVITOVA et al., "Effect of Staphylococcus enterotoxin a on the development of Lewis lung carcinoma in mice". See Abstract 75810, EKSP ONKOL, 11(1): 73-74. | [X] - Biological Abstracts, Volume 88, No. 8, issued 10 October 1989, SHCHEGLOVITOVAL et al, "Effect of Staphylococcal enterotoxin A-sensitized spleen cells on the metastasizing of mouse Lewis lung carcinoma". See Abstract 87362, EKSP ONKOL, II(2): 54-57. | [X] - Biological Abstracts, Volume 84, No. 5 issued 01 September 1987, SHCHEGLOVITOVA et al., "Nonspecific antitumor activity of staphylococcal enterotoxins". See Abstract 48345, EKSP ONKOL, 9(1): 28-30. | [X] - Infection and Immunity, Vol. 57, No. 7, issued July 1989, PENARRUBIA et al., "Selective Proliferation of Nautural killer Cells among Monoate Depleted Peripheral Blood Mononuclear Cells as a Result of Stimulation with Staphylococcal Enterotoxin B" pgs. 2057-2065. See "introduction". | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., Vol. 72, No. 9, issued September 1975, CARSWELL et al., "An endotoxin-induced serum factor that causes necrosis of tumors" pgs. 3666-3670. See entire document. | [Y] - Infection and Immunity, Vol. 57, No. 1, issued January 1989, FAST et al. "Toxic Shock Syndrome Associated Staphylococcal and Streptococcal Pyrogenic Toxins are Potent Inducers of Tumor Necrosis Factor Production", pgs. 291-294. See Abstract. | Examination | - NATURE 339 (1989) 221-3; CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY 122 (1989) 108-121 J EXP MED 171 (1990) 455-464; J IMMUNOL 144 (1990) 2473-9 |