EP0517747 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR UNDERGROUND GASIFICATION OF COAL OR BROWNCOAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grupping, Arnold Willem Josephus, Prof.Ir. Anjelierenlaan 3 2111 BP Aerdenhout / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states Grupping, Arnold Willem Josephus, Prof.Ir. Anjelierenlaan 3 NL-2111 BP Aerdenhout / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/51] | Application number, filing date | 91904545.0 | 18.02.1991 | [1992/51] | WO1991NL00027 | Priority number, date | NL19900000426 | 22.02.1990 Original published format: NL 9000426 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113236 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517747 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517747 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/247, E21F15/08, E21B43/295 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
E21B43/295 (EP,US);
E21B43/006 (EP,US);
E21B43/247 (EP,US);
E21F15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1992/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTER TAGE VERGASUNG VON KOHLE ODER BRAUNKOHLE | [1992/51] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR UNDERGROUND GASIFICATION OF COAL OR BROWNCOAL | [1992/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE GAZEIFICATION SOUTERRAINE DE CHARBON OU DE LIGNITE | [1992/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.1994 | 28.02.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.11.1995 | FR | 02.11.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 02.11.1995 | |
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/36] | DE | 03.02.1996 | |
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | DE | 03.02.1996 | Cited in | International search | GB2004297 [ ] (GRUPPING ARNOLD); | EP0053418 [ ] (GRUPPING ARNOLD W); | EP0089085 [ ] (GRUPPING ARNOLD W); | DE3441993 [ ] (VNII ISPOLZOVANIA [SU]); | EP0197566 [ ] (INSTITUTION POUR LE DEV DE LA [BE]) |