EP0471084 - OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION COMPOSITION CONTAINING NONSTEROIDAL ANTIPHLOGISTIC ANALGESIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Takashi Shiseido Laboratories, 1050, Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91904803.3 | 02.03.1991 | [1992/08] | WO1991JP00280 | Priority number, date | JP19900049452 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: JP 4945290 | [1992/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112821 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471084 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471084 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.09.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/10, A61K47/02 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K45/00 (KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/08] | A61K45/08, A61K31/19, A61K31/405, A61K31/135, A61K47/10, A61K9/107 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | WÄSSERIGE EMULSION MIT NICHT STEROIDHALTIGEN ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDEN SCHMERZMITTELN | [1992/08] | English: | OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION COMPOSITION CONTAINING NONSTEROIDAL ANTIPHLOGISTIC ANALGESIC | [1992/08] | French: | COMPOSITION D'EMULSION AQUEUSE CONTENANT UN ANALGESIQUE ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE STEROIDIEN | [1992/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1991 | Translation filed | 28.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1991 | Search fee paid | 28.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 16.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0216303 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0245756 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [Y]US4465629 (MAUGHAN REX G [US]); | [A]FR2633516 (CLARINS [FR]) | International search | [A]EP0216303 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]JPS53113787 (KAWAKEN FINE CHEMICALS CO); | [A]JPS5988419 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPS5452734 (KANEBO LTD); | [A]JPS608215 (KAO CORP); | [A]JPS59116212 (TERUMO CORP); | [A]JPH01242521 (NIKKO CHEMICALS); | [A]JPS6413020 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]JPS5933211 (SATO PHARMA); | [A]JPS63150221 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]JPS61215320 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JPS58185514 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [A]EP0055029 (KOWA CO [JP]) |