EP0517770 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AND REGULATING THE PRIMARY NUCLEATION OF IRON MELTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SinterCast AB Box 10203 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states SinterCast AB Box 10203 S-100 55 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states SINTERCAST LTD. 44/45 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÄCKERUD, Stig, Lennart 963 Stratford Lane Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Ekelöf, Carl Herman, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Ekelöf, Carl Herman, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91905157.3 | 25.02.1991 | [1992/51] | WO1991SE00144 | Priority number, date | SE19900000678 | 26.02.1990 Original published format: SE 9000678 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113176 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517770 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517770 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C21C1/08, C22C33/08 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
C21C1/10 (EP,US);
C21C1/08 (KR);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN UND BEEINFLUSSEN DER PRIMÄRKEIMBILDUNG VON EISENSCHMELZEN | [1992/51] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AND REGULATING THE PRIMARY NUCLEATION OF IRON MELTS | [1992/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE LIMITATION ET DE REGULATION DE LA NUCLEATION PRIMAIRE DE COULEES DE FER | [1992/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.1995 | BE | 17.05.1995 | DK | 17.05.1995 | NL | 17.05.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
DK | 17.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 17.05.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3360364 (IVEY KENNETH H, et al); | [A]US3617259 (DOLIWA HEINZ-ULRICH); | [A]DE2245902 (SCHMIDT GMBH KARL); | [A]US4046509 (BACKERUD STIG LENNART); | [A]DE2753853 (CASPERS KARL HEINZ); | [A]EP0004819 (UNIVERSELLE ACETYLENE ELECT [FR]); | [A]EP0030043 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]); | [A]WO8601755 (SINTERCAST AB [SE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol 10, No 116, P452, Abstract of JP 60-244845, publ 1985-12-04 (TAKAOKA KOGYO K.K.). |