EP0466919 - PHOTOGRAPHIC SILVER HALIDE MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR FORMING REVERSAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUGH, Spencer, Alan 260 Hillary Lane Penfield, NY 14526 / US | 02 /
REED, Kenneth, Joseph 35 West Amy Lane Rochester, NY 14626 / US | 03 /
COHEN, Jacob, Issac 69 Eastland Avenue Rochester, NY 14618 / US | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Buff, Michel, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Buff, Michel, et al Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91905395.9 | 04.02.1991 | [1992/04] | WO1991US00759 | Priority number, date | US19900476925 | 08.02.1990 Original published format: US 476925 | US19910647852 | 30.01.1991 Original published format: US 647852 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112566 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0466919 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0466919 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, G03C1/035, G03C5/50 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
G03C1/035 (EP);
G03C5/50 (EP);
G03C7/3022 (EP);
G03C2001/03535 (EP);
G03C2001/03558 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/27] |
Former [1992/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | PHOTOGRAPHISCHES SILBERHALOGENIDMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON UMKEHRBILDERN | [1992/04] | English: | PHOTOGRAPHIC SILVER HALIDE MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR FORMING REVERSAL IMAGES | [1992/04] | French: | MATERIAU PHOTOGRAPHIQUE EN HALOGENURE D'ARGENT ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'IMAGES INVERSIBLES | [1992/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4623612 ; | [X]GB2095853 |