EP0517823 - DATA CORRECTIONS APPLICABLE TO REDUNDANT ARRAYS OF INDEPENDENT DISKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRO TECHNOLOGY, INC. 5065 E. Hunter Avenue Anaheim California 92807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states MICRO TECHNOLOGY, INC. 5065 E. Hunter Avenue Anaheim, California 92807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLIDER, Joseph, S. 3292 Murray Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
POWERS, David, T. 2265 Bayo Claros Circle Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 03 /
IDLEMAN, Thomas, E. 2660 Brady Court Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91906009.5 | 27.02.1991 | [1992/51] | WO1991US01257 | Priority number, date | US19900488750 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: US 488750 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113394 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517823 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F11/08 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F11/08 (EP,US);
G06F11/1076 (EP,US);
G11C29/70 (EP,US);
G11C29/88 (EP,US);
G06F11/1612 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/51] | Title | German: | DATENBERICHTIGUNGEN ANWENDBAR AUF REDUNDANTE ANORDNUNGEN UNABHÄNGIGER SPEICHERPLATTEN | [1992/51] | English: | DATA CORRECTIONS APPLICABLE TO REDUNDANT ARRAYS OF INDEPENDENT DISKS | [1992/51] | French: | CORRECTIONS DE DONNEES POUR SYSTEMES DE DISQUES INDEPENDANTS REDONDANTS | [1992/51] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 28.06.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1428407 (PLESSEY CO LTD); | [Y]US4380029 (BODE ELWOOD J); | [A]WO8910594 (AMDAHL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0344999 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0071315 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al); | [A]EP0180821 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4757440 (SCHEUNEMAN JAMES H [US]) |