EP0479962 - HOUSING BLOCK FOR HYDRAULIC BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEHL, Georg Talaeckerstr. 61 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | 02 /
SCHMITT, Edgar Am Wolfberg 111 D-7143 Vaihingen-Enz / DE | 03 /
SIEGEL, Heinz Hohenloherstr. 86 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | 04 /
EBERSPAECHER, Peter Hölderlinweg 4 D-7300 Esslingen / DE | 05 /
BENZINGER, Roland Solitudestr. 65 D-7000, Stuttgart 31 / DE | [1992/16] | Application number, filing date | 91906159.8 | 22.03.1991 | [1992/16] | WO1991DE00253 | Priority number, date | DE19904013160 | 25.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4013160 | [1992/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9116220 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479962 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479962 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B60T8/368 (EP,US);
B60T8/36 (KR);
Y10S303/10 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/16] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSEBLOCK FÜR EIN HYDRAULISCHES BREMSSYSTEM | [1992/16] | English: | HOUSING BLOCK FOR HYDRAULIC BRAKE SYSTEM | [1992/16] | French: | BLOC-CARTER POUR UN SYSTEME DE FREINAGE HYDRAULIQUE | [1992/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4568131 (BLOMBERG FOLKE I [SE], et al); | [X]DE2128168 (TELDIX GMBH); | [A]US4690465 (TAKEDA KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]WO8301929 (GARLOCK INC [US]); | [A]GB2018922 (BENDIX CORP); | [A]EP0344544 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) |