EP0521946 - DETERGENT MOULDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/35] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUJEAN, Hans-Josef Carl-Friedrich-Schinkel-Strasse 43 D-4047 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
HOLZ, Erich Ostwaldstrasse 17 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
KURTH, Olivier Mühlenhof 1-3 D-4010 Hilden / DE | [1993/02] | Application number, filing date | 91906451.9 | 15.03.1991 | [1993/02] | WO1991EP00498 | Priority number, date | DE19904009532 | 24.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4009532 | [1993/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9114766 | Date: | 03.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521946 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/04, C11D17/00, C11D3/39, B65D81/32 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
B65D81/32 (EP);
C11D17/003 (EP);
C11D17/044 (EP);
C11D3/3947 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI, NL [1993/02] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTEL-FORMKÖRPER | [1993/02] | English: | DETERGENT MOULDING | [1993/02] | French: | DOSES DE DETERGENT MOULEES | [1993/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB836108 ; | [A]US4348292 ; | [A]GB1038492 ; | [A]EP0236136 ; | [A]EP0132726 ; | [A]EP0356707 ; | [XP]JPH0255800 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, no. 10, 3 September 1990 Columbus, OhioUSA Seite 155; ref. no. 81018 siehe Zusammenfassung & JP-A-90055800 ( SHINKO KAGAKU KOGYO K. K.) 26 Februar 1990 |