EP0484473 - DRILL HEAD WITH NOZZLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSK GUIDED MICROTUNNELING TECHNOLOGIES GMBH SPEZIALTIEFBAUGERÄTE Kleiner Plom 4 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE | [1992/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHN, Rolf Falkenstrasse 4 D-7518 Bretten / DE | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91906677.9 | 25.03.1991 | [1992/20] | WO1991EP00572 | Priority number, date | DE19904016965 | 25.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4016965 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119074 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484473 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484473 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0484473 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/18, E21B7/06, E21B10/60 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
E21B7/065 (EP,US);
E21B7/18 (EP,KR,US);
E21B10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | BOHRKOPF MIT DÜSEN | [1992/20] | English: | DRILL HEAD WITH NOZZLES | [1992/20] | French: | TREPAN A BUSES | [1992/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2783972 (BEAT FEHLMANN HANS); | [A]US3211244 (CORDARY BRUCE J); | [X]US3269471 (ALEXANDER ROBERT T); | [X]US3324957 (GOODWIN ROBERT J, et al); | [A]GB1086535 (GULF RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CO); | [A]CA871004 (HARD METALS CANADA LTD); | [Y]GB2126267 (COAL IND); | [X]US4515227 (CERKOVNIK JERRY [US]); | [A]US4583603 (DORLEANS ANDRE [FR], et al); | [Y]US4850440 (SMET NIC H W [BE]) |