EP0556177 - TOP COAT FOR ACID CATALYZED RESISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONLEY, Willard, Earl 16 Chadeayne Avenue Cornwall, NY 12518 / US | 02 /
KWONG, Ranee, Wai-Ling 31 Mina Drive Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 03 /
KVITEK, Richard, Joseph 12 Channingville Road Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 04 /
LANG, Robert, Neal RD 2 Box 286 Pleasant Valley, NY 12569 / US | 05 /
LYONS, Christopher, Francis 408 Beaver Road La Grangeville, NY 12540 / US | 06 /
MIURA, Steve, Seiichi 97 Alda Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | 07 /
MOREAU, Wayne, Martin 10 Lydia Drive Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 08 /
SACHDEV, Harbans, Singh 23 Fairview Drive Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | 09 /
WOOD, Robert, Lavin 6 Argent Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | [1993/34] | Representative(s) | Therias, Philippe, et al Compagnie IBM FRANCE Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Therias, Philippe, et al Compagnie IBM FRANCE, Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1993/34] | Schuffenecker, Thierry, et al Compagnie IBM France, Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 91906782.7 | 21.12.1990 | [1993/34] | WO1990US07618 | Priority number, date | US19900587273 | 18.09.1990 Original published format: US 587273 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205474 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556177 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/11 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
G03F7/092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/34] | Title | German: | ÜBERZUG FÜR SÄURE-KATALYSIERTEN PHOTOLACK | [1993/34] | English: | TOP COAT FOR ACID CATALYZED RESISTS | [1993/34] | French: | REVETEMENT SUPERFICIEL POUR VERNIS A MASQUER CATALYSES PAR ACIDE | [1993/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/52] | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0290916 ; | [X]DE2523719 ; | [X]DE3216658 |