EP0474826 - SHOCK ABSORBER WITH DOPPLER FLUID VELOCITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONROE AUTO EQUIPMENT COMPANY 1 International Drive Monroe Michigan 48161 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states MONROE AUTO EQUIPMENT COMPANY 1 International Drive Monroe Michigan 48161 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERASTAS, Michael, W. 14700 Ida West Road Petersburg, MI 49270 / US | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/12] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91906875.9 | 13.03.1991 | [1992/12] | WO1991US01739 | Priority number, date | US19900496195 | 15.03.1990 Original published format: US 496195 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113777 | Date: | 19.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474826 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474826 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.09.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60G17/08 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
B60G17/01933 (EP,US);
B60G17/0152 (EP,US);
B60G2202/24 (EP,US);
B60G2400/202 (EP,US);
B60G2400/7162 (EP,US);
B60G2400/91 (EP,US);
B60G2401/10 (EP,US);
B60G2401/176 (EP,US);
B60G2500/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/12] | B60G17/015, B60G11/08 | Designated contracting states | DE [1992/12] | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER MIT DOPPLER-AUFNEHMER FÜR DIE FLÜSSIGKEITSGESCHWINDIGKEIT | [1994/24] | English: | SHOCK ABSORBER WITH DOPPLER FLUID VELOCITY SENSOR | [1992/12] | French: | AMORTISSEUR AVEC DETECTEUR DOPPLER DE VITESSE D'UN FLUIDE | [1992/12] |
Former [1992/12] | DÄMPFER MIT DOPPLER-FLÜSSIGKEITGESCHWINDIGKEITSDETEKTOR | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1991 | Search fee paid | 14.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3435677 (GARDNER FREDERICK H); | [A]DE3704472 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0218126 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0162237 (BOPP & REUTHER GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2911768 (F & O ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS) | International search | US4090407 [ ] (SHULER COBIA B, et al); | US4674768 [ ] (MORRA LUIGI [IT]); | GB2177475 [ ] (DUNLOP LTD); | DE8702817U [ ] |