EP0524978 - MELTING FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAROC OY AB 21600 Pargas / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states PAROC OY AB SF-21600 Pargas / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLIN, Peter, Arnold, Henrik Revonkatu 3-5 SF-20760 Piispanristi / FI | 02 /
HJERPPE, Pertti, Kalevi Tennbyvägen 40 bost. 26 SF-21600 Pargas / FI | 03 /
NYGARDAS, Carl-Gustav Vitmossevägen 3 SF-21600 Pargas / FI | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91907017.7 | 10.04.1991 | [1993/05] | WO1991FI00105 | Priority number, date | FI19900001842 | 11.04.1990 Original published format: FI 901842 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115433 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524978 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/425, F27B3/14 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
C03B5/43 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | SCHMELZOFEN | [1993/05] | English: | MELTING FURNACE | [1993/05] | French: | FOUR DE FUSION | [1993/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AU550316B ; | [A]GB1585155 ; | [A]US3849587 |