EP0520031 - PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ALUMINIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/01] | PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR HEATING ALUMINIUM | ||
[1995/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [1996/04] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 300 Brookside Avenue Ambler, Pennsylvania 19002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AWAD, Sami, B. 509 Drexel Avenue Drexel Hill, PA 19026 / US | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/01] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 91907113.4 | 06.03.1991 | [1993/01] | WO1991US01536 | Priority number, date | US19900492695 | 13.03.1990 Original published format: US 492695 | US19900583051 | 14.09.1990 Original published format: US 583051 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9114014 | Date: | 19.09.1991 | [1991/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520031 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520031 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/34, C10M173/02 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
C10M105/22 (EP,US);
C10M105/32 (EP,US);
C10M105/68 (EP,US);
C10M105/74 (EP,US);
C10M107/34 (EP,US);
C10M107/48 (EP,US);
C10M125/00 (EP,US);
C10M125/10 (EP,US);
C10M125/16 (EP,US);
C10M125/18 (EP,US);
C10M125/20 (EP,US);
C10M129/44 (EP,US);
C10M137/02 (EP,US);
C10M145/28 (EP,US);
C10M145/36 (EP,US);
C10M145/38 (EP,US);
C10M159/06 (EP,US);
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
C23C22/34 (EP,US);
C10M2201/00 (EP,US);
C10M2201/02 (EP,US);
C10M2201/022 (EP,US);
C10M2201/06 (EP,US);
C10M2201/062 (EP,US);
C10M2201/063 (EP,US);
C10M2201/065 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (EP,US);
C10M2201/08 (EP,US);
C10M2201/081 (EP,US);
C10M2201/082 (EP,US);
C10M2201/083 (EP,US);
C10M2201/084 (EP,US);
C10M2201/085 (EP,US);
C10M2201/18 (EP,US);
C10M2203/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/10 (EP,US);
C10M2203/102 (EP,US);
C10M2203/104 (EP,US);
C10M2203/106 (EP,US);
C10M2203/108 (EP,US);
C10M2205/14 (EP,US);
C10M2205/16 (EP,US);
C10M2205/17 (EP,US);
C10M2205/18 (EP,US);
C10M2207/021 (EP,US);
C10M2207/04 (EP,US);
C10M2207/103 (EP,US);
C10M2207/123 (EP,US);
C10M2207/124 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/128 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/22 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2606 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2623 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2805 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,US);
C10M2207/345 (EP,US);
C10M2209/103 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1033 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1045 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1055 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1065 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1075 (EP,US);
C10M2209/108 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1085 (EP,US);
C10M2209/109 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1095 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/0806 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2215/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2215/285 (EP,US);
C10M2217/04 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10M2223/02 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10M2223/06 (EP,US);
C10M2223/061 (EP,US);
C10M2223/065 (EP,US);
C10M2223/10 (EP,US);
C10M2225/00 (EP,US);
C10M2225/003 (EP,US);
C10M2225/02 (EP,US);
C10M2225/025 (EP,US);
C10M2225/04 (EP,US);
C10M2225/0405 (EP,US);
C10M2225/041 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/20 (EP,US);
C10N2040/24 (EP,US);
C10N2040/241 (EP,US);
C10N2040/242 (EP,US);
C10N2040/243 (EP,US);
C10N2040/244 (EP,US);
C10N2040/245 (EP,US);
C10N2040/246 (EP,US);
C10N2040/247 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
C10N2040/42 (EP,US);
C10N2040/44 (EP,US);
C10N2040/50 (EP,US);
C10N2050/01 (EP,US);
C10N2050/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2209/108, C10M2209/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALUMINIUM | [1993/01] | English: | PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ALUMINIUM | [1995/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION POUR TRAITER L'ALUMINIUM | [1995/50] |
Former [1993/01] | PROCESS AND COMPOSITION FOR HEATING ALUMINIUM | ||
Former [1993/01] | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION POUR CHAUFFER L'ALUMINIUM | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/50: Teilanmeldung 94118255.2 eingereicht am 06/03/91 | EPB 1995/50: Divisional application 94118255.2 filed on 06/03/91 | EPB 1995/50: Demande divisionnaire 94118255.2 déposée le 06/03/91 | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94118255.2 / EP0643127 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2141934 [ ] (AMCHEM PROD); | DE2313330 [ ] (BASF WYANDOTTE CORP); | FR2347459 [ ] (AMCHEM PROD [US]); | US4212750 [ ] (GORMAN JEREMY W [US]); | EP0032306 [ ] (AMCHEM PROD [US]); | FR2487381 [ ] (PRODUITS IND CIE FSE [FR]); | EP0137057 [ ] (DIVERSEY WYANDOTTE INC [CA]); | US4859351 [ ] (AWAD SAMI B [US]) |