EP0524991 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR BENDING AT LEAST A SECTION OF A ROD MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, FR | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruhl, Heinz Manigoldstrasse 5 D-97199 Ochsenfurt / DE | [1993/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUHL, Heinz Manigoldstrasse 5 D-8703 Ochsenfurt / DE | 02 /
ZAHLAUS, Helmut Amselweg 9 D-8716 Kirchzell / DE | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Salzstrasse 11 a Postfach 21 44 D-63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 91907412.0 | 12.04.1991 | [1993/05] | WO1991EP00701 | Priority number, date | DE19904012095 | 14.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4012095 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9116155 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524991 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524991 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/025 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B21D7/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BIEGEN VON ZUMINDEST EINEM ABSCHNITT EINES STABFÖRMIGEN MATERIALS | [1993/05] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR BENDING AT LEAST A SECTION OF A ROD MATERIAL | [1993/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE D'AU MOINS UNE SECTION D'UN MATERIAU EN BARRE | [1993/05] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.03.1994 | DK | 02.03.1994 | ES | 02.03.1994 | FR | 02.03.1994 | GB | 02.03.1994 | GR | 02.03.1994 | NL | 02.03.1994 | SE | 02.03.1994 | CH | 30.04.1994 | LI | 30.04.1994 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2002/23] | BE | 02.03.1994 | |
DK | 02.03.1994 | ||
GB | 02.03.1994 | ||
GR | 02.03.1994 | ||
NL | 02.03.1994 | ||
SE | 02.03.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 02.03.1994 | |
DK | 02.03.1994 | ||
GB | 02.03.1994 | ||
GR | 02.03.1994 | ||
NL | 02.03.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 02.03.1994 | |
DK | 02.03.1994 | ||
GB | 02.03.1994 | ||
NL | 02.03.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 02.03.1994 | |
GB | 02.03.1994 | ||
NL | 02.03.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1994 | ||
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | GB | 02.03.1994 | |
NL | 02.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | GB | 02.03.1994 | Cited in | International search | US3899908 [ ] (SOMOV BORIS STEPANOVICH, et al); | GB749159 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | WO8500023 [ ] (ENACO AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) |