EP0477333 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURAND INTERNATIONAL S.p.A. Via M. De Vizzi, 60 I-20092 Cinisello Balsamo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states EURAND INTERNATIONAL S.P.A. Via M. De Vizzi, 60 I-20092 Cinisello Balsamo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAPELLI, Luigi, Giovanni Via Bettino Da Trezzo, 14 I-20125 Milan / IT | 02 /
MARCONI, Marco, Giuseppe, Raffaele Via Aurora 6 I-20092 Cinisello Balsamo / IT | 03 /
ZEMA, Marco Via Verga 10 I-22100 Como / IT | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Brown, Keith John Symons, et al c/o John Wyeth & Brother Limited Patent and Trademark Department Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH. / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Brown, Keith John Symons, et al c/o John Wyeth & Brother Limited Patent and Trademark Department Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH. / GB | Application number, filing date | 91907609.1 | 09.04.1991 | [1992/14] | WO1991EP00689 | Priority number, date | IT19900020055 | 17.04.1990 Original published format: IT 2005590 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9116043 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477333 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477333 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K9/52 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/50 (KR);
A61K9/2081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN | [1992/14] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS | [1992/14] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [1992/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 03.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0076515 [ ] (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]); | EP0077264 [ ] (AEC CHIM ORGAN BIOLOG [FR]); | EP0181564 [ ] (GERGELY GERHARD [AT]) |