EP0481042 - AMPHOTERIC HYDROGEL FOR MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis Minnesota 55432-3576 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-3576 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEVNE, Allan, H. 1314 - 153rd Lane N.E. Anoka, MN 55303 / US | 02 /
HOLMBLAD, Carolann 31584 Rum River Drive Cambridge, MN 55008 / US | 03 /
PHIPPS, Joseph, B. 5309 Ximines Lane Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | 04 /
HOWLAND, Warren, W. 1211 N. Mississippi Drive Champlin, MN 55008 / US | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Cockbain, Julian, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Cockbain, Julian, Dr., et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91908140.6 | 29.03.1991 | [1992/17] | WO1991US02156 | Priority number, date | US19900502841 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: US 502841 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115250 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481042 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481042 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/16, C09J133/14 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US);
A61N1/0428 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/60, C08L33/26 (EP,US);
C08L33/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09J133/26, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/17] | Title | German: | AMPHOTERES HYDROGEL FÜR MEDIZINISCHE GEGENSTÄNDE | [1992/17] | English: | AMPHOTERIC HYDROGEL FOR MEDICAL DEVICES | [1992/17] | French: | HYDROGEL AMPHOTERE POUR DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX | [1992/17] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.1995 | BE | 12.07.1995 | DK | 12.07.1995 | ES | 12.07.1995 | GR | 12.07.1995 | SE | 12.10.1995 | LU | 31.03.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 12.07.1995 | |
BE | 12.07.1995 | ||
DK | 12.07.1995 | ||
GR | 12.07.1995 | ||
SE | 12.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 12.07.1995 | |
BE | 12.07.1995 | ||
DK | 12.07.1995 | ||
SE | 12.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 12.07.1995 | |
BE | 12.07.1995 | ||
SE | 12.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 12.07.1995 | |
SE | 12.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 12.10.1995 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP61023670 ; | EP0077618 [ ] (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]); | EP0355536 [ ] (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]); | EP0384268 [ ] (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE]) | [X] - WPIL File Supplier, Derwent Publications Ltd., (London, GB), AN 86-073070; & JP-A-61023670 (NISSHIN KAGAKU KOGY) 1 February 1986, & JP61023670 A 19860201 |