EP0483312 - PROCESS FOR ELIMINATING NITRATES AND PHOSPHATES IN THE BIOLOGICAL PURIFICATION OF WASTE WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UTB Buchs AG Technikumstrasse 14 CH-9470 Buchs / CH | [1994/38] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states UTB Umwelttechnik Buchs AG Technikumstrasse 14 CH-9470 Buchs/SG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIER, Urs, Dr. alte Stadtergasse CH-7320 Sargans / CH | 02 /
WYSS, Paul Rosenweg 10 CH-4533 Riedholz / CH | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Riederer, Conrad A. c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Riederer, Conrad A., Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 10 CH-7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 91908223.0 | 16.05.1991 | [1992/19] | WO1991CH00116 | Priority number, date | CH19900001691 | 18.05.1990 Original published format: CH 169190 | [1992/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117959 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483312 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483312 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/30 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
C02F3/1215 (EP);
C02F3/308 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, IT, LI, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NITRAT- UND PHOSPHATELIMINATION BEI DER BIOLOGISCHEN REINIGUNG VON ABWASSER | [1992/19] | English: | PROCESS FOR ELIMINATING NITRATES AND PHOSPHATES IN THE BIOLOGICAL PURIFICATION OF WASTE WATER | [1992/19] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE NITRATES ET DE PHOSPHATES LORS DE L'EPURATION BIOLOGIQUE D'EAUX D'EGOUTS | [1992/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 27.07.1994 | IT | 27.07.1994 | SE | 27.10.1994 | [1999/42] |
Former [1999/22] | DK | 27.07.1994 | |
SE | 27.10.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 27.07.1994 | |
SE | 27.10.1994 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 27.10.1994 | |
Former [1996/28] | SE | 27.10.1994 | |
Former [1995/29] | SE | 27.10.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2740766 (ATTISHOLZ CELLULOSE); | [A]FR2382405 (STAMICARBON [NL]); | [A]EP0087127 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [A]US4488968 (HONG SUN-NAN [US], et al) | Examination | - Abwassertechnik, Band IV, Seiten 239-240; 311-312 |