EP0537161 - ALARM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KINGSTON, John Edward 49 Allestree Drive, Scartho, Nr. Grimsby South Humberside DN33 3DX / GB | [1993/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Craske, Stephen Allan Craske & Co. Shallowford Holsworthy Road Hatherleigh Okehampton Devon EX20 3LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Craske, Stephen Allan Craske & Co. Patent Law Chambers 15 Queens Terrace Exeter South Devon EX4 4HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91908531.6 | 19.04.1991 | [1993/16] | WO1991GB00620 | Priority number, date | GB19900008992 | 21.04.1990 Original published format: GB 9008992 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115989 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537161 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537161 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/681 (EP);
A61B5/0002 (EP);
A61B5/117 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | ALARMSYSTEM | [1993/16] | English: | ALARM SYSTEM | [1993/16] | French: | SYSTEME D'ALARME | [1993/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.10.1996 | BE | 02.10.1996 | CH | 02.10.1996 | DK | 02.10.1996 | ES | 02.10.1996 | FR | 02.10.1996 | IT | 02.10.1996 | LI | 02.10.1996 | NL | 02.10.1996 | SE | 02.01.1997 | DE | 03.01.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
ES | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
NL | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
FR | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
ES | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
FR | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
FR | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
FR | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
FR | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
FR | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
FR | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
DE | 03.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 02.10.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2632899 (VERRIEST ALBERT); | [A]GB1543441 (KALMAN G); | [X]FR2425230 (WEYRICH NICHOLAS [FR]); | [A]US4819860 (HARGROVE JAMES L [CA], et al) |