EP0528845 - SINGLE-BLADE IMPELLER FOR ROTARY PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1999 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METZINGER, Wolfgang Am Zipser Berg 29 D-8570 Pegnitz / DE | 02 /
WITZEL, Rolf Bgm.-Wingerter-Strasse 44 D-6715 Lambsheim / DE | [1993/09] | Application number, filing date | 91908572.0 | 02.05.1991 | [1993/09] | WO1991EP00833 | Priority number, date | DE19904015331 | 12.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4015331 | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118210 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528845 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528845 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/22, F04D29/24 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
F04D29/225 (EP,US);
F04D29/2222 (EP,US);
F04D29/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | EINSCHAUFELRAD FÜR KREISELPUMPEN | [1993/09] | English: | SINGLE-BLADE IMPELLER FOR ROTARY PUMPS | [1993/09] | French: | ROUE A AUBE POUR POMPES CENTRIFUGES | [1993/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1996
20.05.1996
ADMISSIBLE ABS Pump Center GmbH Scheiderhöher Strasse 30-38 53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Lippert, Hans-Joachim Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1996
20.05.1996
ADMISSIBLE ABS Pump Center GmbH Scheiderhöher Strasse 30-38 53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Lippert, Hans-Joachim Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 23.05.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.11.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.01.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.04.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.04.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH189936 (BUCHER GUYER AG MASCH [CH]); | [A]FR1274289 ; | [Y]DE2732863 (BALCKE DUERR AG); | [Y]EP0244844 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) |