EP0608210 - MUTAGENESIS TESTING USING TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS CARRYING TEST DNA SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRATAGENE 11099 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states STRATAGENE 11099 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORGE, Joseph, A. 17021 Circa del Sur Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
SHORT, Jay, M. 320 Delage Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Fisher, Adrian John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91908707.2 | 05.04.1991 | [1994/31] | WO1991US02364 | Priority number, date | US19900505676 | 05.04.1990 Original published format: US 505676 | [1994/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115579 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608210 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A01K67/027, A61K49/00, G01N33/50 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP);
C12N15/8509 (EP);
C12Q1/6897 (EP);
G01N33/5017 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/31] | Title | German: | MUTAGENESETEST UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NICHTMENSCHLICHEN LEBEWESEN, DIE TEST DNA-SEQUENZEN ENTHALTEN | [1994/31] | English: | MUTAGENESIS TESTING USING TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS CARRYING TEST DNA SEQUENCES | [1994/31] | French: | TEST DE MUTAGENESE A L'AIDE D'ANIMAUX TRANSGENIQUES PORTEURS DE SEQUENCES D'ADN TESTS | [1994/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 02.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.11.1992 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M18) | 16.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/22] | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0289121 ; | [YP]EP0370813 ; | [E]WO9217605 | [X] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY. vol. SUPPL, no. 13B, 21 January 1989, NEW YORK, USA page 184 SHORT, J.M. ET AL. 'The effects of eukaryotic methylation on recovery of a Lambda phage shuttle vector from transgenic mice' | [T] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA. vol. 88, no. 18, September 1991, WASHINGTON US pages 7958 - 7962 KOHLER, S.W. ET AL. 'Spectra of spontaneous and mutagen-induced mutations in the lacI gene in transgenic mice' | [XP] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. vol. 18, no. 10, 25 May 1990, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US pages 3007 - 3013 KOHLER, S.W. ET AL. 'Development of a short-term, in vivo mutagenesis assay: the effects of methylation on the recovery of a lambda shuttle vector from transgenic mice' | International search | [Y]US4736866 | [Y] - Science, Volume 241, issued 23 September 1988, McCUNE et al., "The SCID-hu mouse: murine model for the analysis of human hematolymphoid differentiation and function", pages 1632-1639, see the entire document. | [Y] - Science, Volume 242, issued 23 December 1988, NAMIKAWA et al., "Infection of the SCID-hu mouse by HIV-1", pages 1684-1686, see the entire document. | [Y] - Nature, Volume 335, issued 15 September 1988, MOSIER et al., "Transfer of a functional human immune system to mice with severe combined immunodeficiency", pages 256-259, see the entire document. | [Y] - Cell, Volume 41, issued June 1985, PALMITER et al., "Transgenic mice", pages 343-345, see the entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, Volume 83, issued February 1986, GLAZER et al., "Detection and analysis of UV-induced mutations in mammalian cell DNA using a phage shuttle vector", pages 1041-1044, see the entire document. | [Y] - Can. J. Genet. Cytol., Volume 28, issued 1986, SINGH et al., "Genotype- and age-associated in vivo cytogenetic alterations following mutagenic exposures in mice", pages 286-293, see the entire document. | [X] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 16, Number 19, issued 1988, GOSSEN et al., "F. coli C: a convenient host strain for rescue of highly methylated DNA", page 9343, see the entire document. | [Y] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 16, Number 4, issued 1988, RALEIGH et al., "McrA and McrB restriction phenotypes of some E. coli strains and implications for gene cloning", pages 1563-1575, see the entire document. | [Y] - Mutation Research, Volume 181, issued 1987, LOHMAN et al.; "DNA methods for detecting and analyzing mutations in vivo", pages 227-234, see the entire document and especially page 229, left column. | [X] - Mutation Research, Volume 220, issued May 1989, SUMMERS et al., "Lambda phage shuttle vectors for analysis of mutations in mammalian cells in culture and in transgenic mice", pages 263-268, see the entire document. | [X] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, Volume 86, issued October 1989, GOSSEN et al., "Efficient rescue of integrated shuttle vectors from transgenic mice: a model for studying mutations in vivo", pages 7971-7975, see the entire document. |