EP0485547 - ELECTRICAL MACHINE, PREFERABLY A THREE-PHASE ALTERNATOR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFTLMEIER, Roland Im Körnle 81 D-7057 Winnenden / DE | 02 /
PFLÜGER, Gerhard Hegelstr. 12 D-7145 Markgröningen / DE | 03 /
FAKLER, Bernhard Innere Brücke 16 D-7300 Esslingen / DE | 04 /
BÜRGER, Klaus-Georg Lindenweg 18 D-7145 Markgröningen / DE | 05 /
KNORPP, Albrecht Haydnweg 14 D-7141 Murr / DE | [1992/21] | Application number, filing date | 91908828.6 | 08.05.1991 | [1992/21] | WO1991DE00378 | Priority number, date | DE19904018090 | 06.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4018090 | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119346 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485547 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485547 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/22, H02K19/34, H02K16/00, H02K15/12 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
H02K16/00 (EP,US);
H02K15/12 (EP,US);
H02K19/24 (EP,US);
H02K19/34 (EP,US);
H02K9/223 (EP,US);
H02K9/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE, VORZUGSWEISE DREHSTROMGENERATOR FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1992/21] | English: | ELECTRICAL MACHINE, PREFERABLY A THREE-PHASE ALTERNATOR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [1992/21] | French: | MACHINE ELECTRIQUE, DE PREFERENCE ALTERNATEUR TRIPHASE POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [1992/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP60187250 ; | [A]US1584502 (APPLE VINCENT G); | [A]US3758799 (DOCHTERMAN R, et al); | [A]FR2218675 (RIVIERE JACQUES [FR]); | [A]EP0062706 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0231785 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [AP]DE8915212U | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 27 (E-378)(2084) 04 Februar 1986, & JP-A-60 187250 (URAWA KOGYO) 24 September 1985, siehe das ganze Dokument, & JP60187250 A 19850924 |