EP0482162 - TIMED TRIGGERING CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STB Microtechniques S.A. 15a, route de Neuchâtel CH-2072 Saint-Blaise / CH | [1994/18] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states CIPOSA MICROTECHNIQUES S.A. 15a, Route de Neuchâtel CH-2072 Saint-Blaise / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLTZ, Jean-Henri 28, chemin 4-Ministraux CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
MONNIER, Jean-Luc 9, rue du Bois-Gentil CH-2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | 03 /
SERMET, Pierre-André 10, Indiennes CH-2074 Marin / CH | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Roland Nithardt Conseils en Propriété Industrielle SA Y-Parc Swiss Technopole Rue Galilée 7 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Roland Nithardt, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle S.A., Y-Parc Scientifique et Technologique, Chemin de la Sallaz, Case postale 3347 CH-1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | Application number, filing date | 91908850.0 | 10.05.1991 | [1992/18] | WO1991CH00111 | Priority number, date | FR19900006149 | 14.05.1990 Original published format: FR 9006149 | [1992/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118168 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482162 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482162 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E05B43/00 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
E05B43/005 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0024 (EP,US);
E05B2047/003 (EP,US);
E05B47/0012 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7006 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE VERZÖGERTE AUSLÖSUNG EINES MECHANISMUS | [1992/18] | English: | TIMED TRIGGERING CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MECHANISM | [1992/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DU DECLENCHEMENT TEMPORISE D'UN MECANISME | [1992/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.1995
11.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Relhor SA 74, rue du Locle CH-2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / DE Opponent's representative Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.1995
11.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Relhor SA 74, rue du Locle CH-2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / DE Opponent's representative Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | 14.07.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.11.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 30.01.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8605230 (SKYE SA [LU]); | [A]US4875351 (EVANS WALTER R [US], et al) |