EP0487662 - REINFORCED ANTI-BACKLASH NUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERK MOTION PRODUCTS, INC. 1 Kerk Drive Hollis, NH 03049 / US | [1992/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSON, Keith, W. 267 Farley Road Hollis, NH 03049 / US | 02 /
ERIKSON, Kenneth, W. 30 Walnut Hill Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91908931.8 | 24.04.1991 | [1992/23] | WO1991US02810 | Priority number, date | US19900539908 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: US 539908 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119917 | Date: | 26.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487662 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487662 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/20 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
F16H25/2009 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19735 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/23] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE, SPIELFREIE MUTTER | [1992/23] | English: | REINFORCED ANTI-BACKLASH NUT | [1992/23] | French: | ECROU ANTI-JEU RENFORCE | [1992/23] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1318729 ; | [A]USRE32433E |