EP0530229 - OXIDATION COLORANTS FOR KERATIN FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40190 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONRAD, Günther Feuerbachweg 12 D-4010 Hilden / DE | 02 /
MATZIK, Iduna Leibnizstrasse 69 D-4006 Erkrath 2 / DE | 03 /
LIESKE, Edgar Hunsrückenstrasse 40 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1993/12] |
Former [1993/10] | 01 /
KONRAD, Günther Feuerbachweg 12 D-4010 Hilden / DE | ||
02 /
MATZIK, Iduna Auf der Gathe 20 D-4300 Essen 15 / DE | |||
03 /
LIESKE, Edgar Hunsrückenstrasse 40 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91909057.1 | 10.05.1991 | [1993/10] | WO1991EP00874 | Priority number, date | DE19904016177 | 19.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4016177 | [1993/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117739 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530229 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530229 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
A61K8/492 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/13] |
Former [1993/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | OXIDATIONSFÄRBEMITTEL FÜR KERATINFASERN | [1993/10] | English: | OXIDATION COLORANTS FOR KERATIN FIBRES | [1993/10] | French: | COLORANTS D'OXYDATION POUR FIBRES DE KERATINE | [1993/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1916139 (OREAL); | [A]US4013404 (PARENT RICHARD ALFRED, et al); | [A]GB2033392 (IHARA CHEMICAL IND CO) | [A] - Journal of Chemical Society, C, Band 15, 1970, (Newcastle upon Tyne, GB), F. Binns et al.: "Studies related to the chemistry of melanins. Part XIII. Studies on the structure of dopamine-melanin", Seiten 2063-2075, siehe Seite 2067, Spalte 1, Zeilen 26-27 |