EP0527874 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING COINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mars Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean Virginia 22101-3883 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states MARS INCORPORATED 6885 Elm Street McLean Virginia 22101-3883 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURNEAUX, David Michael 31 Eden Way, Winnersh Wokingham, Berkshire RG11 5PQ / GB | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/08] | Wright, Peter David John, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91909320.3 | 29.04.1991 | [1993/08] | WO1991GB00680 | Priority number, date | GB19900010507 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: GB 9010507 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117527 | Date: | 14.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0527874 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527874 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G07D5/08 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
G07D5/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN VON MÜNZEN | [1993/08] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING COINS | [1993/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONTROLE DE PIECES DE MONNAIE | [1993/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.1995 | BE | 23.08.1995 | CH | 23.08.1995 | DK | 23.08.1995 | GR | 23.08.1995 | IT | 23.08.1995 | LI | 23.08.1995 | NL | 23.08.1995 | SE | 23.11.1995 | LU | 30.04.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 23.08.1995 | |
BE | 23.08.1995 | ||
CH | 23.08.1995 | ||
DK | 23.08.1995 | ||
GR | 23.08.1995 | ||
IT | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
NL | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 23.08.1995 | |
BE | 23.08.1995 | ||
CH | 23.08.1995 | ||
DK | 23.08.1995 | ||
GR | 23.08.1995 | ||
IT | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.08.1995 | |
BE | 23.08.1995 | ||
CH | 23.08.1995 | ||
DK | 23.08.1995 | ||
IT | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 23.08.1995 | |
BE | 23.08.1995 | ||
CH | 23.08.1995 | ||
DK | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 23.08.1995 | |
BE | 23.08.1995 | ||
CH | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 23.08.1995 | |
BE | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 23.08.1995 | |
SE | 23.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3034156 (NAT REJECTORS GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2093620 (MARS INC); | [A]EP0062411 (AERONAUTICAL GENERAL INSTR [GB]); | [A]GB2143663 (MARS INC); | [A]GB2143982 (MARS INC); | [A]DE3708275 (MUSASHI ENG KK [JP]); | [A]EP0331530 (SANDEN CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0336018 (NIPPON CONLUX CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0203702 ; | [A]EP0300781 |