EP0528930 - USE OF SUBSTITUTED PHENOLS TO IMPROVE THE LIGHT FASTNESS OF MAGENTA IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/09] | PHOTOGRAPHIC MATERIAL COMPRISING A MAGENTA DYE IMAGE FORMING COUPLER COMBINATION | ||
[1996/40] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1993/09] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANLEY, Paul, Louis 69 Archery Close Wealdstone Middx. HA3 7RX / GB | 02 /
WATTS, Christina, Mary 18 Hutton Gardens Harrow Weald Middx. HA3 6RA / GB | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1993/09] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 91909605.7 | 11.05.1991 | [1993/09] | WO1991EP00897 | Priority number, date | GB19900010966 | 16.05.1990 Original published format: GB 9010966 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118323 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528930 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528930 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0528930 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, G03C7/384, G03C7/392, G03C7/388 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G03C7/3012 (EP,US);
G03C7/384 (EP,US);
G03C7/3885 (EP,US);
G03C7/39216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1996/18] |
Former [1993/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG SUBSTITUIERTER PHENOLE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER LICHTECHTHEIT VON MAGENTAFARBSTOFFBILDERN | [1996/40] | English: | USE OF SUBSTITUTED PHENOLS TO IMPROVE THE LIGHT FASTNESS OF MAGENTA IMAGES | [1996/40] | French: | UTILISATION DE PHENOLS SUBSTITUES POUR UNE STABILITE ACCRUE D'IMAGES A COLORANT MAGENTA ENVERS LA LUMIERE | [1996/40] |
Former [1993/09] | PHOTOGRAPHISCHES MATERIAL DAS EINE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM MAGENTAFARBSTOFFBILDENDEN KUPPLER ENTHÄLT | ||
Former [1993/09] | PHOTOGRAPHIC MATERIAL COMPRISING A MAGENTA DYE IMAGE FORMING COUPLER COMBINATION | ||
Former [1993/09] | MATIERE PHOTOGRAPHIQUE COMPRENANT UNE COMBINAISON D'ACCOUPLEMENT DE FORMATION D'IMAGE A COLORANT MAGENTA | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert AG -Patentabteilung- Postfach D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert AG -Patentabteilung- Postfach D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 07.08.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.02.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.2000 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.08.2000 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2039068 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [X]EP0176845 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]); | [X]EP0257451 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]); | [X]EP0320776 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]); | [A]EP0348135 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) | Opposition | JPH0242437 | US4994359 |