EP0483326 - CONFIGURATION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE VOLUME OF WATER IN CIRCULATION FROM BOILER CIRCUIT TO HEATING CIRCUIT IN A HOT WATER HEATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKMAR ANGEWANDTE ELEKTRONIK GmbH Möllneyer Ufer 17 D-45257 Essen / DE | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LATARIUS, Hans Möllneyer Ufer 17 D-4300 Essen 15 / DE | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1992/19] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Am Ruhrstein 1 D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91909693.3 | 21.05.1991 | [1992/19] | WO1991EP00946 | Priority number, date | DE19904016221 | 19.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4016221 | [1992/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118246 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483326 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483326 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
F24D19/1033 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86517 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DES WASSERMENGENDURCHLAUFVERHÄLTNISSES VON KESSELKREISLAUF ZU HEIZKREISLAUF IN WARMWASSERHEIZUNGSANLAGEN | [1992/19] | English: | CONFIGURATION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE VOLUME OF WATER IN CIRCULATION FROM BOILER CIRCUIT TO HEATING CIRCUIT IN A HOT WATER HEATING SYSTEM | [1992/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LE REGLAGE DES CONDITIONS D'ECOULEMENT D'UN VOLUME D'EAU D'UN CIRCUIT DE CHAUDIERE VERS UN CIRCUIT DE CHAUFFAGE DANS DES INSTALLATIONS DE CHAUFFAGE A EAU CHAUDE | [1992/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 21.09.1994 | ES | 21.09.1994 | FR | 21.09.1994 | GB | 21.09.1994 | GR | 21.09.1994 | NL | 21.09.1994 | SE | 21.12.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | DK | 21.09.1994 | |
ES | 21.09.1994 | ||
GB | 21.09.1994 | ||
GR | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 21.09.1994 | |
GB | 21.09.1994 | ||
GR | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 21.09.1994 | |
GB | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/37] | GB | 21.09.1994 | |
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 21.09.1994 | |
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/34] | SE | 21.12.1994 | |
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 21.12.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1675998 (JANICH HANS JUERGEN); | [A]AT298735B (CENTRA BUERKLE KG ALBERT [DE]); | [A]DE2229820 ; | [A]DE3207427 (TEKMAR ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO [DE]) |