EP0528936 - INSULATION SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR FORMING SUCH AN INSULATION SYSTEM ON A CONDUIT OR CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYGROWICK-INTERNATIONAL APS Donsevej 3 2970 Horsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states HYGROWICK-INTERNATIONAL APS Donsevej 3 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | ||
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states V.I.K. CONSULT ApS Donsevej 3 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORSGAARD, Vagn Donsevej 3 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Kyed, Iver, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Kyed, Iver, et al c/o LEHMANN & REE A/S Grundtvigsvej 37 DK-1864 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 91909774.1 | 14.05.1991 | [1993/09] | WO1991DK00132 | Priority number, date | DK19900001192 | 14.05.1990 Original published format: DK 119290 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118237 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528936 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528936 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/10, F16L59/14 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
B65D90/06 (EP,US);
F16L59/029 (EP,US);
F16L59/10 (EP,US);
F16L59/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | ISOLIERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN ISOLIERSYSTEMS AN EINER LEITUNG ODER AN EINEM CONTAINER | [1993/09] | English: | INSULATION SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR FORMING SUCH AN INSULATION SYSTEM ON A CONDUIT OR CONTAINER | [1993/09] | French: | SYSTEME D'ISOLATION ET PROCEDE SERVANT A MONTER CE SYSTEME D'ISOLATION SUR UN CONDUIT OU UN CONTENEUR | [1993/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SE123644 ; | [A]CH181327 (WERNER KARL [CH]); | [A]US4745760 (PORTER WARREN W [US]); | [A]WO8912199 (REGAL TECH UK [GB], et al) | [A] - Dialog Information Services, File 351, World Patent Index 81-91, Dialog accession No. 007097054, Mitsubishi Plastics Ind: "Heat insulating pipe mfr. by heating precast metallic pipe, covering surface with foamable thermoplastic resin as pipe is inserted into cross head die and foaming", JP 62044421, A, 870226, 8714 |