EP0522091 - USE OF A MBP PEPTIDE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/02] | MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS T-CELL RECEPTOR | ||
[2001/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Correction of patent specification | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL 75 Francis Street Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | For all designated states AUTOIMMUNE, INC. 1199 Madia Street Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL 75 Francis Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | ||
For all designated states AUTOIMMUNE, INC. 1199 Madia Street Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | |||
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL 75 Francis Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | ||
For all designated states AUTOIMMUNE, INC. 1041 Third Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUCHERPFENNING, Kai, W. 117 Park Drive Boston, MA 02215 / US | 02 /
WEINER, Howard, L. 114 Somerset Road Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 03 /
HAFLER, David, Allen 110 Forest Avenue West Newton, MA 02165 / US | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91910085.9 | 29.03.1991 | [1993/02] | WO1991US02218 | Priority number, date | US19900502559 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: US 502559 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115225 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522091 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522091 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0522091 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/08, C12N5/06, A61K38/00, C12Q1/68 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
A61K39/0008 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K14/7051 (EP);
C12Q1/6881 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1993/21] | C12N5/08, C12N5/06, A61K37/02, C12Q1/68 | ||
Former IPC [1993/02] | A61K37/02, C12N5/06, C12N5/08, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/02] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES MBP PEPTIDES ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIKAMENTES FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON MULTIPLER SCLEROSE | [2001/09] | English: | USE OF A MBP PEPTIDE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [2001/09] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN PEPTIDE DE MBP POUR LA PREPARATION D'UN MEDICAMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT THERAPEUTIQUE DE LA SCLEROSE EN PLAQUES | [2001/09] |
Former [1993/02] | BEI MULTIPLER SKLEROSE AUSGEPRÄGTER T-ZELL-REZEPTOR | ||
Former [1993/02] | MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS T-CELL RECEPTOR | ||
Former [1993/02] | RECEPTEUR DE LYMPHOCITES T SE MANIFESTANT DANS LA SCLEROSE EN PLAQUES | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1992 | Search fee paid | 29.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 24.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Request for further processing for: | 13.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 13.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.05.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA vol. 85, no. 22, 15 November 1988, WASHINGTON DC, US pages 8608 - 8612 K. SAKAI ET AL. 'Involvement of distinct murine T-cell receptors in the autoimmune encephalitogenic response to nested epitopes of myelin basic protein.' | International search | [X] - Nature, Vol. 341, issued 12 October 1989, VANDENBARK et al., "Immunization with a synthetic T-cell receptor V-region peptide protects against experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis", pages 541-544, see page 542. | [XP] - Science, Vol. 248, issued 1990, WUCHERPFENNIG et al., "Shares human T-cell Receptor V-beta usage to immunodominant regions of myclin basis protein", see page 4958, Abstract No. 90:334456. | [XP] - J. Exp. Med., Vol. 171, issued June 1990, ZALLER et al., "Prevention and Treatment of Murine Experimental Allergic Encephalomyelitis with T-cell Receptor V.B. Specific Antibodies", pages 1943-1955. See entire document. | [YP] - Journal of Immunology, Vol. 144, No. 12, issued 15 June 1990, HASHIM et al., "Antibodies Specific for VB8 Receptor Peptide Suppress Experimental Autoimmune Encephalomyelitis", pages 4621-4627, see entire document. | Examination | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 144, no. 12, 15 June 1990; HASHIM et al., pp. 4621-4627 |