EP0528955 - PROTEASE DEFICIENT BACTERIAL HOSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION Fruit Street (Bar-3) Boston, MA 02114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUALA, Eva 43 Vincent Avenue Belmont, MA 02178 / US | 02 /
AUSUBEL, Frederick, M. 271 Lake Avenue Newton, MA 02161 / US | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Aulmich, Gerhard, et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Aulmich, Gerhard, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 91910087.5 | 02.05.1991 | [1993/09] | WO1991US03012 | Priority number, date | US19900515940 | 02.05.1990 Original published format: US 515940 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117247 | Date: | 14.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528955 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528955 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N15/01, C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N15/70, C12N5/10, C07K7/00, C07K2/00 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
C12N9/0012 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12N15/70 (EP,US);
C12N15/743 (EP,US);
C12N9/52 (EP,US);
C12R2001/19 (EP,US);
Y10S435/848 (EP,US);
Y10S435/852 (EP,US);
Y10S435/878 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/09] | C12N15/09, C12N15/01, C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N15/70, C12N5/10, C07K7/00, C07K15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | BAKTERIELLE WIRTE MIT PROTEASEMANGEL | [1993/09] | English: | PROTEASE DEFICIENT BACTERIAL HOSTS | [1993/09] | French: | HOTES BACTERIENS A CARENCE EN PROTEASE | [1993/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1992 | Search fee paid | 05.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 07.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8300702 (UNIVERSITY PATENTS INC [US]); | [A]WO8503949 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) | [XP] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY vol. 173, no. 1, January 1991, pages 382 - 390 EVA HUALA ET AL. 'Aerobic inactivation of Rhizobium meliloti NifA in Escherichia coli is mediated by lon and two newly identified genes, snoB and snoC' | International search | [Y] - Journal of Bacteriology, Volume 614, No. 3, issued December 1985, M.R. MAURIZI et al., "Insertional Mutagenesis of the lon gene in Escherichia coli: lon is dispensable", pages 1124-1135, see entire document. | [Y] - The EMBO Journal, Volume 7, No. 1, issued January 1988, J.L. BEYNON et al., "Expression and functional analysis of the Rhozobium meliloti nifa gene", pages 7-14, see entire document. | [Y] - Biological Abstracts, Volume 85, issued 01 June 1988, STRAUCH et al., "An Escherichia coli mutation preventing degradation of abnormal periplasmic proteins", see entire page Abstract No. 110525, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., U.S.A. 85(5):1576-1580. | [Y] - Journal of Bacteriology, Vol. 169, No. 7, issued July 1987, DITTA et al., "The nifA gene of Rhizobium meliloti is oxygen regulated", pages 3217-3223, see entire document. | Examination | - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 173, no. 1, January 1991, pages 382-390; EVA HUALA ET AL.: 'Aerobic inactivation of Rhizobium meliloti NifA in Escherichia coli is mediated by lon and two newly identified genes, snoB and snoC' | - Journal of Bacteriology, Vol. 164, no. 3, 1985; M. R. Maurizi et al, pp.1124-1135 |