EP0535013 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CRYSTALLIZING A MINERAL SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states SOLVAY Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARMONT, Jacques 15, rue des Liégeois B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
DETRY, Léopold 14, avenue Philippe-le-Bon B-1300 Wavre / BE | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Anthoine, Paul, et al SOLVAY Département de la Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Anthoine, Paul, et al SOLVAY Département de la Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 91910301.0 | 12.06.1991 | [1993/14] | WO1991BE00037 | Priority number, date | BE19900000645 | 22.06.1990 Original published format: BE 9000645 | [1993/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200130 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535013 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535013 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D9/02, B01D9/00 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
B01D9/0022 (EP,US);
B01D9/0031 (EP,US);
B01D9/0036 (EP,US);
C30B7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KRISTALLISIEREN EINES MINERALS | [1993/14] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CRYSTALLIZING A MINERAL SUBSTANCE | [1993/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR LA CRISTALLISATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE MINERALE | [1993/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR648701 (KRYSTAL AS); | [Y]FR2561125 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0352847 (SOLVAY [BE]) |