EP0531401 - ENHANCING THE ASSOCIATION OF EXOGENOUS PEPTIDES WITH CLASS I MHC MOLECULES ON IMMUNE SYSTEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCK, Kenneth, L. 59 Dwinell Street West Roxbury, MA 02132 / US | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Wössner, Gottfried HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Wössner, Gottfried Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Uhlandstrasse 14c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91910429.9 | 03.05.1991 | [1993/11] | WO1991US03082 | Priority number, date | US19900521576 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: US 521576 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9116924 | Date: | 14.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531401 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531401 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K38/00, A61K49/00, A61K39/39 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
B01D61/14 (EP);
A61K38/1774 (EP);
A61K39/385 (EP);
A61K39/39 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K2039/5158 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/24] | A61K39/00, A61K37/00, A61K49/00, A61K39/39 | ||
Former IPC [1993/11] | A61K39/00, A61K37/00, A61K49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | ERHÖHUNG DER ASSOZIATION EXOGENER PEPTIDE MIT MHCI-MOLEKÜLEN AUF ZELLEN DES IMMUNSYSTEMS | [1993/11] | English: | ENHANCING THE ASSOCIATION OF EXOGENOUS PEPTIDES WITH CLASS I MHC MOLECULES ON IMMUNE SYSTEM CELLS | [1993/11] | French: | RENFORCEMENT DE L'ASSOCIATION DE PEPTIDES EXOGENES AVEC DES MOLECULES MHC DE LA CLASSE I SUR DES CELLULES DE SYSTEMS IMMUNS | [1993/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 10.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.01.1997 | GR | 22.01.1997 | NL | 22.01.1997 | SE | 22.04.1997 | AT | 03.05.1997 | DK | 03.05.1997 | ES | 05.05.1997 | LU | 31.05.1997 | [2004/37] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 22.01.1997 | |
GR | 22.01.1997 | ||
NL | 22.01.1997 | ||
SE | 22.04.1997 | ||
AT | 03.05.1997 | ||
DK | 03.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 22.01.1997 | |
GR | 22.01.1997 | ||
SE | 22.04.1997 | ||
AT | 03.05.1997 | ||
DK | 03.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/40] | BE | 22.01.1997 | |
SE | 22.04.1997 | ||
AT | 03.05.1997 | ||
DK | 03.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | BE | 22.01.1997 | |
SE | 22.04.1997 | ||
DK | 03.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 22.01.1997 | |
SE | 22.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 22.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO7900160 (NAT RES DEV [GB], et al); | [Y]WO8001986 (SANDERSON A) |