EP0548080 - IMAGE DATA ENCODING AND COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIOM INNOVATION LIMITED 1 Logan Mews London W8 6QP / GB | [1993/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOH, Peng Seng, Mechanical Engineer. Bldg ImperialCollege, Exhibition Road London SW7 2BX / GB | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/20] |
Former [1993/26] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91910434.9 | 29.05.1991 | [1993/26] | WO1991GB00855 | Priority number, date | GB19900011908 | 29.05.1990 Original published format: GB 9011908 | GB19900028204 | 31.12.1990 Original published format: GB 9028204 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119263 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548080 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/64 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
G06T9/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | KODIERUNG UND KOMPRESSION VON BILDDATEN | [1993/26] | English: | IMAGE DATA ENCODING AND COMPRESSION | [1993/26] | French: | CODAGE ET COMPRESSION DE DONNEES D'IMAGES | [1993/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 23.06.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/02] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/02] | Request for further processing for: | 09.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.1998 | Decision despatched | 01.04.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 09.05.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | 12.03.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | 12.03.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | 12.03.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | 12.03.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | 12.03.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | 12.03.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.04.1993 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.12.1996 | 31.05.1997 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.1997 | 31.05.1998 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YP]EP0348207 ; | [Y]US4340940 | [YP] - EP-A-0 348 207 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., JP) 27 December 1989, & EP0348207 A 00000000 | [Y] - US-A-4 340 940 (J.J.WILLIAMS JR. ET AL) 20 July 1982, & US4340940 A 00000000 |