EP0532598 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALWEN, Anders Alfhemsvägen 15 S-182 62 Djursholm / SE | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 91910864.7 | 26.04.1991 | [1993/12] | WO1991SE00299 | Priority number, date | SE19900001989 | 05.06.1990 Original published format: SE 9001989 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118689 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532598 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532598 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21C23/08 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
B21C23/085 (EP);
B21C23/22 (EP);
B21C33/004 (EP);
B21C37/06 (EP);
B22F5/10 (EP);
B22F5/106 (EP);
F28F1/10 (EP);
F28F21/08 (EP);
B22F2005/004 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F5/106 (EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F3/15, B22F3/20 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1993/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ROHREN | [1993/12] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TUBES | [1993/12] | French: | METHODES DE FABRICATION DE TUBES | [1993/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SE413995 |