EP0532613 - ETHYLENE SORBING SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | ||
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC & INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION ( C.S.I.R.O. ) Limestone Avenue Campbell ACT 2601 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNEY, Terence, William 47 Surrey Roadad Mount Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU | 02 /
CHRISTIE, Gregor Bruce Yeo 52 McGregor Street Middle Park, Victoria 3206 / AU | 03 /
HARDIN, Simon, Gerard 33 Newry Street North Fitzroy, VIC 3068 / AU | 04 /
CORRIGAN, Penelope, Anne 7 Aurora Court Springvale South, VIC 3172 / AU | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91911026.2 | 07.06.1991 | [1993/12] | WO1991AU00246 | Priority number, date | AU19900000572 | 08.06.1990 Original published format: AU 57290 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118835 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532613 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532613 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.12.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C01G45/12, C01G49/00, C01G53/00, C01G45/00, A23B7/148, C01G1/00 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C01G45/1207 (EP);
B01J20/0218 (EP);
B01J20/0225 (EP);
B01J20/0229 (EP);
B01J20/0244 (EP);
B01J20/041 (EP);
B01J20/043 (EP);
B01J20/06 (EP);
B01J20/08 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3236 (EP);
B01J20/3289 (EP);
C01F7/785 (EP);
C01G45/1214 (EP);
C01P2002/22 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/12] | C01G45/12, C01G49/00, C01G53/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/12] | Title | German: | SORPTIONSMITTEL FÜR ETHYLEN | [1993/12] | English: | ETHYLENE SORBING SUBSTANCES | [1993/12] | French: | SUBSTANCES DE SORPTION DE L'ETHYLENE | [1993/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 02.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 03.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 11.01.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.1996 | BE | 17.04.1996 | CH | 17.04.1996 | DK | 17.04.1996 | FR | 17.04.1996 | GR | 17.04.1996 | IT | 17.04.1996 | LI | 17.04.1996 | LU | 30.06.1996 | GB | 17.07.1996 | SE | 17.07.1996 | DE | 18.07.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/35] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
CH | 17.04.1996 | ||
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
FR | 17.04.1996 | ||
GR | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
LI | 17.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
GB | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
CH | 17.04.1996 | ||
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
GR | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
LI | 17.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
GB | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
GR | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
GB | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
CH | 22.07.1996 | ||
LI | 22.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
GR | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
GB | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
GB | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
GB | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/30] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
GB | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
DE | 18.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60118175 ; | [A]EP0094983 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]EP0255461 (PEREZ JOSE VELASCO [ES]); | [A]EP0369275 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 85-187995 & JP-A-60 118 175 (SHIRAISHI), & JP60118175 A 00000000 | International search | [A]US4448760 (WELSH JAY Y [US], et al); | [A]US4450148 (WELSH JAY Y [US]); | [A]US4520005 (YAO YUNG-FANG Y [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 96, No. 10, issued 8 March 1982, S. RUBEN, "Alkaline Primary Cell with cathode of Potassium permanganate with lithium hydroxide", page 519, column 1, Abstract No. 76507y. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 100, No. 22, issued 28 May 1984, YAMAMOTO et al., "Studies on the formation of some oxides of maganese in the MN7+-Mn2+-OH system with hydrothermal method", page 640, column 1, Abstract No. 184798d. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 112, No. 8, issued 30 April 1990, DOUGLAS et al., "Analysis of potassium permanganata (KMn04)/sodium hydroxide battery header cleaning procedure", page 230, column 1, Abstract No. 162172r. |