EP0528995 - SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESSOR APPARATUS WITH DYNAMIC WAFER VAPOR TREATMENT AND PARTICLE VOLATILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMITOOL, INC. 655 West Reserve Drive Kalispell Montana 59901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states SEMITOOL, INC. 655 West Reserve Drive Kalispell, Montana 59901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMAN, Eric, J. 120 Midale Kalispell, MT 59901 / US | 02 /
REARDON, Timothy, J. 643 Granite View Drive Kalispell, MT 59901 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Raymon, F. 275 Tamarack Terrace Post Office Box 241 Lakeside, MT 59922 / US | 04 /
OWCZARZ, Aleksander 145 Northridge Drive Kalispell, MT 59901 / US | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1993/09] | Blatchford, William Charles, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91911521.2 | 19.04.1991 | [1993/09] | WO1991US02956 | Priority number, date | US19900524239 | 15.05.1990 Original published format: US 524239 | US19900526052 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: US 526052 | US19900526057 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: US 526057 | US19900526243 | 18.05.1990 Original published format: US 526243 | US19910665942 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: US 665942 | US19910665609 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: US 665609 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117897 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528995 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528995 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
H01L21/68728 (EP);
H01L21/67023 (EP);
H01L21/67075 (EP);
H01L21/6708 (EP);
H01L21/67086 (EP);
H01L21/68785 (EP);
G11B7/26 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/09] | B44C1/22, C03C15/00, C03C25/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALBLEITERSCHICHTEN MIT DYNAMISCHER DAMPFBEHANDLUNG UND TEILCHENVERFLÜCHTIGUNG | [1993/09] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESSOR APPARATUS WITH DYNAMIC WAFER VAPOR TREATMENT AND PARTICLE VOLATILIZATION | [1993/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DYNAMIQUE DE TRANCHES DE SEMICONDUCTEURS EN PHASE VAPEUR ET PAR VOLATILISATION DE PARTICULES | [1993/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1992 | Search fee paid | 12.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97122754.1 / EP0853332 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Request for further processing for: | 10.12.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.07.1998 | ES | 22.07.1998 | GR | 22.07.1998 | IT | 22.07.1998 | DK | 22.10.1998 | SE | 22.10.1998 | LU | 19.04.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/39] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
ES | 22.07.1998 | ||
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
DK | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
LU | 19.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
ES | 22.07.1998 | ||
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
DK | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
ES | 22.07.1998 | ||
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 22.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4749440 (BLACKWOOD ROBERT S [US], et al); | [A]EP0271958 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO8807263 (MONARCH TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) | International search | [A]US4749440 (BLACKWOOD ROBERT S [US], et al) |