EP0491959 - METHOD OF WELDING METALS OF DIFFERENT KIND BY LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGINO, Akihiko Nippondenso Co., Ltd., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-Pref 448 / JP | 02 /
MIYASE, Yoshiyuki Nippondenso Co., Ltd., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-Pref 448 / JP | 03 /
SAKOU, Shuuzi Nippondenso Co., Ltd., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-Pref 448 / JP | 04 /
SHIBATA, Shinzi Nippondenso Co., Ltd., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-Pref 448 / JP | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91911733.3 | 08.07.1991 | [1992/27] | WO1991JP00913 | Priority number, date | JP19900184686 | 12.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18468690 | JP19910088793 | 19.04.1991 Original published format: JP 8879391 | [1992/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200828 | Date: | 23.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491959 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491959 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B23K26/18 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B23K26/32 (EP,US);
B23K26/323 (EP,US);
B23K2101/34 (EP,US);
B23K2103/12 (EP,US);
B23K2103/18 (EP,US);
B23K2103/22 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/27] | B23K26/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHWEISSEN VON METALLEN AUS VERSCHIEDENEN SORTEN MITTELS LASERS | [1992/27] | English: | METHOD OF WELDING METALS OF DIFFERENT KIND BY LASER | [1992/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE DE METAUX DE TYPES DIFFERENTS AU MOYEN D'UNE ENERGIE LASER | [1992/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1992 | Translation filed | 11.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1992 | Search fee paid | 11.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58065592 ; | [A]JP2019421 ; | [X]EP0283003 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 157 (M-227)9 July 1958 & JP-A-58 065 592 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK ) 19 April 1983, & JP58065592 A 19830419 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 149 (C-705)22 March 1990 & JP-A-20 19 421 ( AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE AND TECHNOL ) 23 January 1990, & JP2019421 A 19900123 | International search | [A]JPS50160148 ; | [X]JPH0640958B (JGC CORP) |