EP0491053 - WATER-SOLUBLE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES WITH ANTITUMORAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/26] | WATER-SOLUBLE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVE | ||
[1996/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 2-9 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-9 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASE, Muneaki, 24-13, Oizumi-machi 1-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178 / JP | 02 /
NARITA, Toshiharu, 10-9, Aobacho 3-chome Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo 189 / JP | 03 /
KOMATSU, Toshihiko, 2-1, Uwado-shinmachi Kawagoe-shi Saitama-ken 350 / JP | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91911753.1 | 03.07.1991 | [1992/26] | WO1991JP00894 | Priority number, date | JP19900176672 | 04.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17667290 | [1992/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200971 | Date: | 23.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491053 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491053 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/08, C07D403/14, C07D417/14 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D241/08 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINDERIVATE MIT ANTITUMOR WIRKUNG | [1996/06] | English: | WATER-SOLUBLE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES WITH ANTITUMORAL PROPERTIES | [1996/06] | French: | DERIVES DE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE HYDROSOLUBLES AYANT DES PROPRIETES ANTITUMORALES | [1996/06] |
Former [1992/26] | WASSERLÖSLICHES BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINDERIVATE | ||
Former [1992/26] | WATER-SOLUBLE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVE | ||
Former [1992/26] | DERIVE DE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE HYDROSOLUBLE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1992 | Translation filed | 26.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 26.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.02.1996 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0256137 (ZENYAKU KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0125475 (ZENYAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) | International search | [X]JPS61152660 (ZENYAKU KOGYO KK) |